This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 13:06:42 (UTC).

BEVERLY HILLS REGIONAL SURGERY CENTER VS UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 BEVERLY HILLS REGIONAL SURGERY CENTER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5052

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVERLY HILLS REGIONAL SURGERY CENTER

Defendant

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Beverly Hills Regional Surgery Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beverly Hills Regional Surgery Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beverly Hills Regional Surgery Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beverly Hills Regional Surgery Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beverly Hills Regional Surgery Center (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A