This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 19:52:59 (UTC).

BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P., VS TUFELD CORPORATION,

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L P , filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against TUFELD CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4286

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY L.P.

Defendant

TUFELD CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAULY ANDREW S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/8/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

9/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUFELD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAULY ANDREW STUART