This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 08:22:17 (UTC).

BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS 9777 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD Q, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 9777 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD Q, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9758

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

9777 WILSHIRE BOULEVARD Q LLC A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WEWORK COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAITELMAN MICHAEL A

Defendant Attorney

COHEN DAVID MARC

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/31/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

2/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

2/25/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 9777 Wilshire Boulevard Q, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 9777 Wilshire Boulevard Q, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WeWork Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN DAVID MARC