This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2020 at 01:41:12 (UTC).

BEULAH DEITCH VS ETHAN BROWN ESQ ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 BEULAH DEITCH filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ETHAN BROWN ESQ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3477

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEITCH BEULAH

Defendants

BROWN NERI SMITH & KAHN LLP

BROWN ETHAN ESQ.

COLON SARA ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FELDMAN KENNETH C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

10/12/2018: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/2/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Service by Mail

1/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/2/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

2/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Proof of Service by Mail

2/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/3/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/18/2019

6/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/18/2019

Notice of Related Case

6/18/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/18/2019

6/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/18/2019

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Lawanna Walters Corson, CSR# 7135

2/28/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Lawanna Walters Corson, CSR# 7135

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Ethan Brown, ESQ. (Defendant); Sara Colon, ESQ. (Defendant); Brown, Neri, Smith & Kahn, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of David D. Samani); Filed by Ethan Brown, ESQ. (Defendant); Sara Colon, ESQ. (Defendant); Brown, Neri, Smith & Kahn, LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by First-Class Mail-Civil; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Beulah Deitch (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3477    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 34

SUBJECT: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Moving Party: Erin L. Grey, counsel for Plaintiff Beulah Deitch

Resp. Party: None

The motion to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Beulah Deitch is GRANTED.

BACKGROUND:

Plaintiff Beula Deitch commenced this action against Defendants on September 28, 2018 for: (1) fraud and rescission; (2) financial elder abuse; (3) declaratory relief; (4) breach of contract; and (5) breach of fiduciary duty. This case arises out of Defendants’ representation of Plaintiff in a financial elder abuse action. Plaintiff takes issue with Defendants’ staffing and billing relating to the underlying proceeding, asserting that (1) Defendants’ misrepresented the manner in which they would bill, (2) Mr. Brown was not involved as represented, and (3) Defendants’ billing was improper and excessive.

On February 28, 2019, the Court granted Defendants’ motion to compel arbitration.

On June 18, 2019, the Court found that the following cases BC686144, ****3477, and 19STCP02346, are related, with BC686144 as the lead case.

On January 2, 2020, Plaintiff’s counsel, Erin L. Grey, filed the instant motion to be relieved as counsel.

ANALYSIS:

An attorney moving to be relieved as counsel under California Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) must meet the requirements set out in California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362. To comply with rule 3.1362, the moving party must submit the following forms: (1) Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; (2) Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; and (3) Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(a), (c), (e).) The moving party must serve the aforementioned forms on the client and all other parties who have appeared in the case. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(d).) Further, when the client is served by mail, the attorney's declaration must show that the client's address was confirmed within the last 30 days and how it was confirmed. (Id.) Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)

Counsel’s Motion complies with all of the requirements of California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362, in that Counsel provided a notice of motion and motion to be relieved as counsel; an order granting attorney’s motions to be relieved as counsel; and a declaration in support of the motion to be relieved as counsel. Additionally, the declaration states that Counsel’s client has been served by mail and Counsel confirmed by conducting a background search within the past 30 days that the addresses are current. (See Declaration, No. 3(a) and (b).) Counsel also filed a proof of service that demonstrating she served all other parties who have appeared in the case.

This motion in unopposed.

The motion to be relieved as counsel is GRANTED.