This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 17:38:02 (UTC).

BETTY NALBANTIAN VS BEVERLY HILLS BMW, A DEALERSHIP OF SONIC AUTOMOTIVE, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 BETTY NALBANTIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS BMW, A DEALERSHIP OF SONIC AUTOMOTIVE, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0938

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NALBANTIAN BETTY

Defendants

BEVERLY HILLS BMW A DEALERSHIP OF SONIC AUTOMOTIVE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

RAMEZANI SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELKONIAN LENA

Defendant Attorney

KOLAR ELIZABETH L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

3/11/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/11/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

3/11/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

4/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2024
  • Hearing11/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • Hearing05/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Unavailability of Counsel); Filed by Betty Nalbantian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Betty Nalbantian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Beverly Hills BMW, a dealership of Sonic Automotive, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Sean Ramezani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Beverly Hills BMW, a dealership of Sonic Automotive, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Sean Ramezani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Beverly Hills BMW, a dealership of Sonic Automotive, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Sean Ramezani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Betty Nalbantian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Betty Nalbantian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Betty Nalbantian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELKONIAN LENA