This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2020 at 04:43:14 (UTC).

BETTER NEIGHBORHOODS INC VS CITY OF LANCASTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 BETTER NEIGHBORHOODS INC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LANCASTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB, DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB and JOHN A. TORRIBIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5020

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB

JOHN A. TORRIBIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BETTER NEIGHBORHOODS INC.

BETTER NEIGHBORHOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY OF LANCASTER

LANCASTER CITY OF

CITY OF LANCASTER A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Interested Parties

LANCASTER VALLEY PARTNERS LLC

LANCASTER VALLEY PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SINGH GURJIT

SINGH GURJIT RICHARD

Respondent and Interested Party Attorney

BURNS ALLISON ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

RETURNED MAIL

7/22/2019: RETURNED MAIL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate - CERTIFICATE CERTIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

6/26/2019: Certificate - CERTIFICATE CERTIFICATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

2/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Other - - List Of Responsible Agencies

10/9/2018: Other - - List Of Responsible Agencies

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

1/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/15/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/15/2018

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/15/2018

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/27/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - Notice of Hearing Pursuant to Public Resources Code Section 21167.4

10/15/2018: Notice - Notice of Hearing Pursuant to Public Resources Code Section 21167.4

Proof of Service by Mail

10/25/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Legacy Document -

9/14/2018: Legacy Document -

Proof of Service by Mail -

10/12/2018: Proof of Service by Mail -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE IC

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE IC

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF ETC.....

9/14/2018: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF ETC.....

NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • Hearing02/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department G at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department G, John A. Torribio, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department G, John A. Torribio, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Better Neighborhoods Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate (Certification of Administrative Record); Filed by City of Lancaster, a municipal corporation (Respondent); City Council of the City of Lancaster (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Better Neighborhoods Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • Docketproof of service by mail of notice of case reassignment; Filed by Better Neighborhoods Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Better Neighborhoods Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Better Neighborhoods Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 1; (Assigned Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE IC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF ETC.....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY COUNCIL OF THE CITY LANCASTER is a litigant

Latest cases where LANCASTER CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LANCASTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS ALLISON E.