Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 01:37:59 (UTC).

BETH HOLDEN, ET AL. VS BENJAMIN REININGER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 BETH HOLDEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BENJAMIN REININGER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2576

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLDEN BETH

Defendants

REININGER CAROLINE

PARADIS REINE

REININGER BENJAMIN

LINDSTROM CARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BREMER KEITH

Other Attorneys

CRISSMAN JEFFERY

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/10/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

11/13/2020: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

12/2/2020: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARZ

12/9/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARZ

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/5/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Hearing04/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Benjamin Reininger (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Marz); Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Marz); Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beth Holden (Plaintiff); Marz Holden-Montini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLDEN BETH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRISSMAN JEFFERY