This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 01:05:54 (UTC).

BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP VS CLARENCE WALTON, SR

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CLARENCE WALTON, SR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3084

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP

Defendant

WALTON CLARENCE SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEADOR LOREN NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/18/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/29/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

12/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less