This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 06:34:27 (UTC).

BEST SOLAR POWER INC. VS. DANIEL PONCE

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 BEST SOLAR POWER INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL PONCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN J. KRALIK and SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6205

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN J. KRALIK

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BEST SOLAR POWER INC.

LANKREY DAVID

AHARONI ELKANA ERIC

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

JACKSON KEVIN

YGRENE ENERGY FUND INC. A DELAWARE CORP

RENOVATE AMERICA INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

RODRIGUEZ DANIEL PONCE

PONCE DANIEL

WE LOAN MONEY INC.

RICKMAN DESTYN ANTHONY

HOMEBRIDGE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

PONCE DANIEL AKA DANIEL PONCE RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STONE ELLIOTT H.

STONE ELLIOTT H

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDING JONATHAN FREDERICK

CHO DANIEL S.

RODRIGUEZ RENAY GRACE

CHO DANIEL S

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/1/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

4/9/2019: Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

9/29/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Case Management Statement

1/10/2018: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/12/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

1/12/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/30/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/20/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/5/2018: Unknown

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/26/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Answer

6/13/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/11/2018: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

7/11/2018: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/13/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service by Mail

9/13/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice

12/7/2018: Notice

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice (Release of Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Best Solar Power, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Best Solar Power, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by We Loan Money, Inc., a Wyoming Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice-Pending Action; Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Best Solar Power Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less