This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2023 at 02:01:42 (UTC).

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL S. MURPHY, ROBERT B. BROADBELT and THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5388

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL S. MURPHY

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

BANK OF THE OZARKS

CASE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS I LLC

MCGUIRE BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AYVAZI RAFIK

Defendant Attorney

CLAUDIO JOHN P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

10/9/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

Joint Status Conference Report

10/4/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

1/4/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

Status Conference Report

12/16/2022: Status Conference Report

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

12/8/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice of Related Case

10/5/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Appearance

4/1/2022: Notice of Appearance

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/7/2022: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order Minute Order (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...)

2/16/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) filed by plaintiff Best Contracting Services, Inc. against the Honorable Theresa M. Traber - Dept. 47

2/16/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) filed by plaintiff Best Contracting Services, Inc. against the Honorable Theresa M. Traber - Dept. 47

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...) of 02/16/2022

2/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER - REGARDING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFI...) of 02/16/2022

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

2/16/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

2/14/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

2/14/2022: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/17/2024

Hearing06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 06/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketMinute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Post-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/17/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by: CASE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS I, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketMinute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Post-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/09/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022

DocketStatus Conference Report; Filed by: MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Not Related

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
02/15/2022

DocketAddress for Rafik Ayvazi (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); CASE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS I, LLC (Defendant); BANK OF THE OZARKS (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); CASE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS I, LLC (Defendant); BANK OF THE OZARKS (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MCGUIRE BUILDERS, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); CASE REAL ESTATE PARTNERS I, LLC (Defendant); BANK OF THE OZARKS (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Theresa M. Traber in Department 47 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less