Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 18:04:30 (UTC).

BERYL SCHWARTZ, ET AL. VS JOCELYN'S LOVING PLACE CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 BERYL SCHWARTZ filed an Other lawsuit against JOCELYN'S LOVING PLACE CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1396

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCHWARTZ NAN

SCHWARTZ BERYL

Defendants

ESPIRITU JOCELYN

JOCELYN'S LOVING PLACE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

GARCIA STEPHEN M.

Defendant Attorney

REID BRYAN R.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/3/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Separate Statement

5/19/2021: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

5/19/2021: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT JOCELYN LOVING PLACE CORP.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE A

5/19/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT JOCELYN LOVING PLACE CORP.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE A

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT JOCELYN LOVING PLACE CORP.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

5/19/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT JOCELYN LOVING PLACE CORP.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOU

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT JOCELYN LOVING PLACE CORP.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST

5/19/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT JOCELYN LOVING PLACE CORP.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST

Case Management Statement

4/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/4/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

5/4/2021: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Proof of Personal Service

5/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Motion for Summary Adjudication

4/5/2021: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Answer

2/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (from Defendant Jocelyn's Loving Place Corp to Form Interrogatories, Set One) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (from Defendant Jocelyn's Loving Place Corp to Special Interrogatories, Set One) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (and Production and Documents from defendants Jocelyn's Loving Place Corp to Request for Identification and Production of Documents, Set One) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (from Defendant Jocelyn's Loving Place Corp to Request for Admissions, Set One) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ERRATA RE COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES); Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (declaration of nan schwartz); Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beryl Schwartz (Plaintiff); Nan Schwartz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21STCV01396    Hearing Date: June 2, 2021    Dept: 34

SUBJECT: (1) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set One)

Moving Party: Plaintiff Beryl Schwartz

Resp. Party: Defendant Jocelyn’s Loving Place Corp.

(2) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set One)

Moving Party: Plaintiff Beryl Schwartz

Resp. Party: Defendant Jocelyn’s Loving Place Corp.

(3) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production (Set One)

Moving Party: Plaintiff Beryl Schwartz

Resp. Party: Defendant Jocelyn’s Loving Place Corp.

(4) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions (Set One)

Moving Party: Plaintiff Beryl Schwartz

Resp. Party: Defendant Jocelyn’s Loving Place Corp.

The motions to compel further discovery responses is taken OFF CALENDAR. The Court orders the parties to attend an informal discovery conference prior to ruling on these motions. (See Department 34 Trial Orders, part VII(B).) The Court orders the parties contact Department 34’s judicial assistant, Reyna Navarro, at (213) 633-0154 to schedule this informal discovery conference.

BACKGROUND:

This action arises out of allegations of elder abuse during Plaintiff’s treatment at a care facility for the elderly located at 803 N. Genesee Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90046. (Complaint, ¶¶ 1-12.)

On January 12, 2021, Plaintiff Beryl Schwartz, by and through her Successor in Interest, Nan Schwartz, commenced this action against Defendants Jocelyn’s Loving Place Corp. and Jocelyn Espiritu for (1) elder abuse; and (2) negligent hiring and supervision.

On January 18, 2021, Plaintiff filed a notice of errata re: complaint for damages.

On February 18, 2021, the Court denied without prejudice Plaintiff’s notice of related action.

On May 4, 2021, Plaintiff filed the instant motions to compel further responses from Defendant Jocelyn’s Loving Place Corp. to set one of (1) form interrogatories; (2) special interrogatories; (3) request for production of documents; and (4) request for admissions.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff moves to compel Defendant Jocelyn’s Loving Place Corp. to provide further responses to (1) Special Interrogatories, Set One, Numbers 3, 14, 22, and 23; (2) Form Interrogatories, Set One, Number 12.1; (3) Request for Production of Documents, Set One, Numbers 1, 11, and 33; and (4) Request for Admissions, Set One, Numbers 9, 12, 21, 26, 28, 29, and 30. (SROG Motion, pp. 1:28-2:4; FROG Motion, pp. 1:28-2:3; RFPD Motion, p. 2:1-5; RFA Motion, pp. 1:28-2:4.)

Department 34 Trial Orders, part VII, subpart (B) states:

“If there are numerous or particularly complicated motions to compel further discovery, the Court will order counsel to attend an Informal Discovery Conference prior to ruling on the motion(s). The moving party is strongly encouraged to arrange for an Informal Discovery Conference prior to the date for the scheduled hearing on the motions.”

The Court finds that it would be beneficial for the parties to raise the issues present in these motions at an informal discovery conference with the Court in an attempt to resolve these issues.

The motions to compel further discovery responses is taken OFF CALENDAR. The Court orders the parties to attend an IDC prior to ruling on these motions. (See Department 34 Trial Orders, part VII(B).) The Court orders the parties contact Department 34’s judicial assistant, Reyna Navarro, at (213) 633-0154 to schedule this informal discovery conference.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL