This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2022 at 15:51:04 (UTC).

BERTHA MEDINA VS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 BERTHA MEDINA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0887

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA BERTHA

Defendants

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC

U.S. BANK N.A. AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ON BEHALF OF THE HOLDERS OF BEAR STEARNS ASSET BACKED SECURITIES I TRUST 2007-HE6 ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-HE6

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Bertha Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bertha Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bertha Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bertha Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.