This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2020 at 07:39:28 (UTC).

BERTHA CUEVA VS CRAIG TAKIGUCHI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 BERTHA CUEVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CRAIG TAKIGUCHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1780

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUEVA BERTHA

Defendants

MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

4069 DUQUESNE AVENUE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TAKIGUCHI CRAIG

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINTON MATTHEW L

Defendant Attorneys

CLARK WILLIAM JUSTIN

LEE RANDALL J.

SCHROEDER ERIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Case Management Statement

11/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

7/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

Substitution of Attorney

7/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

7/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TREVOR C. DONOVAN

6/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TREVOR C. DONOVAN

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING ISO MOTION TO STRIKE

6/24/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING ISO MOTION TO STRIKE

Demand for Jury Trial

6/6/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Case Management Statement

6/11/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/11/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/5/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

5/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE AND LOCATION OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

5/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE AND LOCATION OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/10/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION RE MOTION TO STRIKE

4/25/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION RE MOTION TO STRIKE

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL DECLARATION

4/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL DECLARATION

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

4/22/2019: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Complaint

1/17/2019: Complaint

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE PARTIES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 664.6; Filed by Bertha Cueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department P; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 04/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Bertha Cueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bertha Cueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Craig Takiguchi (Defendant); 4069 DUQUESNE AVENUE, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (ISO Motion to Strike); Filed by Craig Takiguchi (Defendant); 4069 DUQUESNE AVENUE, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Craig Takiguchi (Defendant); MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Matthew L Brinton (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bertha Cueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bertha Cueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bertha Cueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK WILLIAM JUSTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, RANDALL J