This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 01:00:51 (UTC).

BERTHA CASTILLO VS CHRISTOPHER DUANE BALAG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 BERTHA CASTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER DUANE BALAG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5253

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO BERTHA

Defendants

BALAG CHRISTOPHER DUANE

BALAG SYLVIA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINESTONE ALAN E

Defendant Attorney

FELDMAN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

5/26/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE) OF 09/21/2021

9/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE) OF 09/21/2021

Notice of Related Case

9/21/2021: Notice of Related Case

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2024
  • Hearing04/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:12 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Related Case) of 09/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Christopher Duane Balag (Defendant); Sylvia Marie Balag (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Christopher Duane Balag (Defendant); Sylvia Marie Balag (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christopher Duane Balag (Defendant); Sylvia Marie Balag (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Bertha Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bertha Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bertha Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bertha Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bertha Castillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINESTONE ALAN