This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 17:21:22 (UTC).

BERRY, RUBY LEE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 BERRY, RUBY LEE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5343

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERRY-BAUSLEY SHARON DENISE

Assignee

INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY INC.

Decedent

BERRY RUBY LEE

Not Classified By Court

KRAAKEVIK PATTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GAUGH KENNETH RAY

Assignee Attorney

SCHROEDER STEVEN DALE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

5/28/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Assignment - - Sharon Berry-Bausley's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest

8/5/2021: Assignment - - Sharon Berry-Bausley's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest

Request - Special Notice

8/5/2021: Request - Special Notice

Letters (Initial)

7/20/2021: Letters (Initial)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

7/15/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/12/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Minute Order

7/1/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

6/28/2021: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

6/28/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

6/28/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

Supplement

6/28/2021: Supplement

Minute Order

9/17/2021: Minute Order

Assignment - Assignment

10/8/2021: Assignment - Assignment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • Hearing12/01/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAssignment (Assignment ); Filed by Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAssignment (- Sharon Berry-Bausley's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest ); Filed by Assignee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSupplement; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INHERITANCE FUNDING CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHROEDER STEVEN DALE