This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 14:05:37 (UTC).

BERNARDO ALVARADO ET AL VS CHRISTOPHER JAMES OLIVAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 BERNARDO ALVARADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER JAMES OLIVAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO, OWEN LEE KWONG, EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5901

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

OWEN LEE KWONG

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ALVARADO YVETTE CAROLINA

ALVARADO BERNARDO

ALVARADO GENESIS

ALVARADO BATRES WILLIAM

BATRES BERNARDO ALVARADO

RAMIREZ JOANNA

Respondents and Defendants

RAMIREZ RUDY

RAMRIEZ JOANNA

VISALAYA LLC

OLIVAS CHRISTOPHER JAMES

THE HOST

DOES 1 TO 50

OLIVAS JOEL

OLIVAS BLANCA

HOST THE

VISALAYA LLC DBA THE HOST AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS

RAMIREZ JOANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

VARGAS FERNANDO D. ESQ.

VARGAS FERNANDO D

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

BONN ELIZABETH C. ESQ.

SHEEDY CRISTOPHER M. ESQ.

MILLER RANDALL A.

KAIMAN BARRY GORDON

STEFFY JUDITH JOANNE

BONN ELIZABETH C

BONN ELIZABETH CURRIN ESQ.

KUTZ LAUREN B

MILLER RANDALL ALLEN

KAIMAN BARRY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Exhibit List

2/28/2022: Exhibit List

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/21/2022

3/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 03/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

3/21/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL

2/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE TO APPEAR AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TIME OF TRIAL

2/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE TO APPEAR AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TIME OF TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO APPEAR AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TIME OF TRIAL

2/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE TO APPEAR AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TIME OF TRIAL

Witness List

2/17/2022: Witness List

Jury Instructions

2/17/2022: Jury Instructions

Exhibit List

2/17/2022: Exhibit List

Statement of the Case

2/17/2022: Statement of the Case

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITIONS

2/17/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/22/2022

2/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/22/2022

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

12/29/2021: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

11/30/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Ruling

12/1/2021: Notice of Ruling

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • Hearing06/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docketat 3:29 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Bernardo Alvarado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement) of 03/21/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Christopher James Olivas (Defendant); Blanca Olivas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Bernardo Alvarado (Plaintiff); Yvette Carolina Alvarado (Plaintiff); William Alvarado Batres (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Bernardo Alvarado (Plaintiff); Yvette Carolina Alvarado (Plaintiff); William Alvarado Batres (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bernardo Alvarado (Plaintiff); Yvette Carolina Alvarado (Plaintiff); William Alvarado Batres (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****5901 Hearing Date: October 21, 2021 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

BERNARDO ALVARADO, et al.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CHRISTOPHER JAMES OLIVAS, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: ****5901

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR A DMISSION ADMITTED, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

October 21, 2021

On September 14, 2017, Plaintiffs Bernardo Alvarado, Yvette Carolina Alvarado, William Alvarado Batres, and Genesis Alvarado (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed this wrongful death action against Defendants Christopher James Olivas (“Olivas”), Joel Olivas, Blanca Olivas, Joanna Ramirez, Rudy Ramirez, and Vislaya LLC dba The Host (“Defendant”). On October 13, 2016, Olivas allegedly drove under the influence while in the course and scope of his employment with Defendant and caused a collision that resulted in the death of Daysi De La Paz Batres-Saravia.

On July 13, 2021, Plaintiffs served Requests for Admission (Set Two) on Defendant. Having received no responses, Plaintiff met and conferred with defense counsel in a letter dated September 7, 2021 and a telephone conversation on September 8, 2021. Plaintiff then proceeded to file this ex parte application for an order shortening time for the hearing on to shorten time to have the requests for admission deemed admitted. Plaintiff also requests monetary sanctions.

Where a party fails to timely respond to a request for admission, the propounding party may move for an order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (b).) The party who failed to respond waives any objections to the demand, unless the court grants them relief from the waiver, upon a showing that the party (1) has subsequently served a substantially compliant response, and (2) that the party’s failure to respond was the result of mistake, inadvertence, or excusable neglect. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subds. (a)(1)-(2).) The court shall grant a motion to deem admitted requests for admissions, “unless it finds that the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).)

Defendant did not oppose this motion and it is undisputed that responses to Plaintiffs’ Requests for Admission (Set Two) have not been served. Accordingly, Plaintiffs’ motion is GRANTED.

Where a party fails to provide a timely response to requests for admission, “[i]t is mandatory that the court impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) on the party or attorney, or both, whose failure to serve a timely response to requests for admission necessitated this motion.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).)

Plaintiffs’ request for sanctions is GRANTED. Sanctions are imposed against Defendant and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the amount of $510.00 for 1 hour at Plaintiff’s counsel’s hourly rate of $450.00 and $60.00 in filing fees, to be paid within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

'


Case Number: ****5901    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO COMPEL VISALAYA, LLC’S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

On September 14, 2017, Plaintiffs Bernardo Alvarado, Yvette Carolina Alvarado, William Alvarado Batres, and Genises Alvarado (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed this action against defendant Visalaya, LLC dba The Host (“Defendant”) and others. On January 29, 2019, Plaintiff served Defendant with special interrogatories. Plaintiff gave a two-week extension on the responses. Defendant did not serve responses. Plaintiff filed this motion. Defense counsel then submitted a declaration stating Defendant served verified responses on January 21, 2020. Therefore, the motion is MOOT.

However, the court may award sanctions in favor of a party who files a motion to compel discovery, even where the requested discovery was provided to the moving party after the motion was filed. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1348(a).) Plaintiffs’ request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED. Sanctions are imposed against Defendant and defense counsel, jointly and severally, in the amount of $560 to be paid within 20 days of the date of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISALAYA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUTZ LAUREN B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAIMAN BARRY