This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 18:03:26 (UTC).

BERNARDINO MARTINEZ VS WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 BERNARDINO MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4377

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ BERNARDINO

Defendants

WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

NEST STEVE

WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

MARUBO ANTONIO

WESTFIELD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPELES KEVIN ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

LOPEZ ZAHER

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DECLARATION OF MA YRA GUTIERREZ AND DECLARATION OF BERNARDINO MARTINEZ

8/29/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DECLARATION OF MA YRA GUTIERREZ AND DECLARATION OF BERNARDINO MARTINEZ

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/26/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Service by Mail

7/26/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/26/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

6/28/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

5/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/29/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

4/16/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/20/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Proof of Personal Service

3/14/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • Hearing03/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketReply (Defendant Westfield, LLC's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action); Filed by Westfield, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MAYRA GUTIERREZ REGARDING ENGLISH/SPANISH TRANSLATION); Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketOpposition (TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DECLARATION OF MA YRA GUTIERREZ AND DECLARATION OF BERNARDINO MARTINEZ); Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF BERNARDINO MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION); Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Zaher Lopez in Support of Defendant Westfield, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action); Filed by Westfield, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Westfield, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bernardino Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIPELES KEVIN A