This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 04:43:22 (UTC).

BERNARD SCHUDA, ET AL. VS AMERICAN BILTRITE INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 BERNARD SCHUDA, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN BILTRITE INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3406

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCHUDA BERNARD

SCHUDA ANIKA

Defendants

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC.

A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO.

BIRD INCORPORATED FKA BIRD & SON INC.

CARRIER CORPORATION

DAP INC. AKA LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO. INC.

DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS L.P. FKA AZROCK INDUSTRIES INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

H.B. FULLER COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIED SIGNAL INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KOHLER COMPANY

LENNOX INDUSTRIES INC.

LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO. INC.

MANNINGTON MILLS INC.

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANY

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHRAFI BENNO BEHNAM

Defendant Attorneys

DUFFY JOSEPH

FOLEY PATRICK JAMES

KARREN BRENT M.

KATERNDAHL JOHN PAUL

KIM JESSICA SOO

LOVE MARK ANTHONY

MONROE MONICA WILLIAMS

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

SHAFFER D SCOTT

WEGLARZ CLAIRE C.

FIOLA NAAMAN ASIR

AMEELE MELANIE L.

BAIME COLLEEN E.

CHUSID BRUCE GARY

DEJARDIN BRADFORD JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

10/7/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: WEITZ & LUXENBERG P.C.)

11/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: WEITZ & LUXENBERG P.C.)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

12/15/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW GAYOSO TO APPEAR AS CO COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS

12/15/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW GAYOSO TO APPEAR AS CO COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION DECLARATION OF MARC WILLICK

12/16/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION DECLARATION OF MARC WILLICK

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR ADMISSION PR...)

12/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR ADMISSION PR...)

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

12/17/2021: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Substitution of Attorney

12/30/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW GAYOSO TO APPEAR AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF O

12/30/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW GAYOSO TO APPEAR AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF O

Substitution of Attorney

1/14/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/9/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Appearance

2/16/2022: Notice of Appearance

Substitution of Attorney

3/4/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: WEITZ & LUXENBERG P.C.)

3/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: WEITZ & LUXENBERG P.C.)

Notice of Appearance

3/25/2022: Notice of Appearance

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • Hearing08/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Weitz & Luxenberg P.C.)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Domco Products Texas, L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Bernard Schuda (Plaintiff); Anika Schuda (Plaintiff); Christopher Schuda (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Bernard Schuda (Plaintiff); Anika Schuda (Plaintiff); Christopher Schuda (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Domco Products Texas, L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bernard Schuda (Plaintiff); Anika Schuda (Plaintiff); Christopher Schuda (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Bernard Schuda (Plaintiff); Anika Schuda (Plaintiff); Christopher Schuda (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bernard Schuda (Plaintiff); Anika Schuda (Plaintiff); Christopher Schuda (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVITON MANUFACTURING CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where MANNINGTON MILLS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KOHLER CO. A WISCONSIN CORPORATION is a litigant