This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 10:08:00 (UTC).

BERNARD HARDY VS SOUTH BAY FAMILY HEALTH CARE, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BERNARD HARDY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SOUTH BAY FAMILY HEALTH CARE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2888

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDY BERNARD

Defendant

SOUTH BAY FAMILY HEALTH CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS ANITA

Defendant Attorney

TURNER ANNE M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/22/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/7/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/17/2020

Answer

4/14/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/9/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

7/21/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause - Settlement - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice, Entire Action); Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by South Bay Family Health Care, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Advanced and Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docketat 11:20 AM in Department 40; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by South Bay Family Health Care, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bernard Hardy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less