This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 14:10:34 (UTC).

BERNADITA COLLINS VS PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES ENCINO HOSPITAL, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 BERNADITA COLLINS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES ENCINO HOSPITAL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0029

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLINS BERNADITA

Defendants

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES ENCINO HOSPITAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KHOUSADIAN ALISA

SEZGIN ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/3/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS

4/15/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

6/7/2022: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Prime Healthcare Services-Encino Hospital, LLC Erroneously Sued As PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES ENCINO HOSPITAL, LLC (Defendant); PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Arbitrate Claims); Filed by Prime Healthcare Services-Encino Hospital, LLC Erroneously Sued As PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES ENCINO HOSPITAL, LLC (Defendant); PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Bernadita Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bernadita Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bernadita Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bernadita Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bernadita Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bernadita Collins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ENCINO HOSPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHOUSADIAN ALISA