Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2020 at 14:03:03 (UTC).

BERNABE SALAZAR VS COLLYN NATHANIEL MILLER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 BERNABE SALAZAR filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COLLYN NATHANIEL MILLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0863

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAZAR BERNABE

Defendants

MILLER COLLYN NATHANIEL

LYFT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

KELLY SPENCER H.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

10/27/2020: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

10/27/2020: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

Receipt for Transmitted Record

10/27/2020: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

9/30/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO STA...) OF 09/30/2020

9/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO STA...) OF 09/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO STA...)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO STA...)

PI General Order

6/9/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/3/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • Hearing11/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:06 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Stipulation and Order to Transfer Venue to Sta...) of 09/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation and Order to Transfer Venue to Sta...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to transfer venue); Filed by Bernabe Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bernabe Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bernabe Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bernabe Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant