This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 17:00:19 (UTC).

BENNY STEINFIELD ET AL VS RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 BENNY STEINFIELD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8559

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEINFIELD BENNY

Defendants

RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC.

ESHEL RON S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSNER ZACHARY MILES

Defendant Attorney

KAUFMAN THOMAS ROY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/17/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Initial Status Conference Order

6/8/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 06/08/2021

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 06/08/2021

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Declaration

6/25/2021: Declaration

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

7/2/2021: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/7/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Appearance

7/2/2021: Notice of Appearance

Case Management Order

7/7/2021: Case Management Order

Answer - DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/5/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling Responsive Pleading) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Responsive Pleading)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDefendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Filed by Reliance Home Services, Inc. (Defendant); Ron S. Eshel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Report; Filed by Benny Steinfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Reliance Home Services, Inc. (Defendant); Ron S. Eshel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Benny Steinfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Benny Steinfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 2:40 PM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 06/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Benny Steinfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benny Steinfield (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crosner, Zachary Miles