This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 04:18:01 (UTC).

BENJAMIN STORCK VS MODERN AUCTIONS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 BENJAMIN STORCK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MODERN AUCTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6911

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STORCK BENJAMIN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

LOUGHREY PETER

LOUGHREY SHANNON

LOS ANGELES MODERN AUCTIONS

MODERN AUCTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BALISTOCKY SUSAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WHITE JOHNNY

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF JOHNNY WHITE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2) RE GOOD FAITH ATREMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER

4/17/2018: DECLARATION OF JOHNNY WHITE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(A)(2) RE GOOD FAITH ATREMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOHNNY WHITE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 435.5

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOHNNY WHITE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 435.5

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

Minute Order

6/11/2018: Minute Order

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/25/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/25/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

6/28/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

10/3/2018: Case Management Statement

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

3/7/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION, AND RESTITUTION DUE TO FRAUD; RESCISSION DUE TO MISTAKE; VIOLATION OF STATUTE; FRAUD; NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

3/7/2018: COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION, AND RESTITUTION DUE TO FRAUD; RESCISSION DUE TO MISTAKE; VIOLATION OF STATUTE; FRAUD; NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Benjamin Storck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Benjamin Storck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Benjamin Storck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Benjamin Storck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Benjamin Storck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION, AND RESTITUTION DUE TO FRAUD; RESCISSION DUE TO MISTAKE; VIOLATION OF STATUTE; FRAUD; NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN AUCTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE JOHNNY