This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:23:12 (UTC).

BENJAMIN MURPHY VS FREEWAY AUTO GROUP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 BENJAMIN MURPHY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FREEWAY AUTO GROUP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0645

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY BENJAMIN

Defendants

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONES JASON A.

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

3/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

3/5/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

3/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

11/6/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/15/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/29/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Settlement

11/20/2018: Notice of Settlement

Answer

12/3/2018: Answer

Summons

10/9/2018: Summons

Affidavit

10/9/2018: Affidavit

Other -

10/9/2018: Other -

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration

10/29/2018: Declaration

Complaint

10/9/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 3:11 PM in Department 34; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date) of 03/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Declaration (of Mailing); Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Plaintiffs' Statement of Actual and Punitive Damages; Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Affidavit (of Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code 1780(d)); Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Benjamin Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN