This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2021 at 21:30:48 (UTC).

BENJAMIN CAMPBELL, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 BENJAMIN CAMPBELL filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL J. BUCKLEY, ANN I. JONES and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5235

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMPBELL BENJAMIN

OZONE THERAPIES GROUP

TAMSHEN ALLAN

GROSS GEOFFREY

STREAKER ROBERT

BROOKS MADELYN

CLAYTON LINH

JIMENEZ RAYMOND

GROSS PAULINE

TUDOR AARON

DISPENZA JOEL

CLAYTON WILLIAM

WEISER MARK

BROOKS SALLY

PERACHIO SUSAN

VISUETA RICHARD

HYATT ALEXANDRA

PIERSON WILLIAM

CATALDE BRIAN

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

79 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINS BILL III

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG ALEXANDER

BASS LEON JR.

CARDOZA BRIAN ANTHONY

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

DIXON DOUGLAS JAMES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/30/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/18/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FIRE CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FI...)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FIRE CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

5/28/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

5/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-THIRD PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 3:00 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 4:40 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Informal Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Eva Tully-Giles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Lindsay Whitmeyer (Plaintiff); Winston Tudor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Ida Tully-Giles (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Tully (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Hannah Tully-Giles (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Tully (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Andrea Ruhge (Plaintiff); Justin Levya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:26 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 05/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Benjamin Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benjamin Campbell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBINS BILL III