Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 01:15:45 (UTC).

BENJAMIN BUSH VS HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 BENJAMIN BUSH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2189

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSH BENJAMIN

Defendants

HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS LLC

PARALLON ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY MARCUS JOSEPH

GROMBACHER KILEY LYNN

KING LIRIT ARIELLA

Defendant Attorneys

SIMMONS RICHARD JAY

HAMILTON MELANIE MAUREEN

KEARNAGHAN JASON WADE

HABIB HILARY ANN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF PUTATIVE CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION LAWSUIT AND ORDER

1/7/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF PUTATIVE CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION LAWSUIT AND ORDER

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

10/14/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING OF OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING OF OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/22/2019: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/30/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/29/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/14/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/21/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/14/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Related Case

10/22/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

7/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

7/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/9/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation RE: Dismissal Of Putative Class and Representative Action Lawsuit and Order; Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Marcus J. Bradley in Support of Stipulation RE: Voluntary Dismissal of Putative Class and Representative Action Lawsuit); Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:05 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Order to Show Ca...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReOSC ReDismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: OSC Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC (Defendant); Parallon Enterprises LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Benjamin Bush (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARRALLON ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Habib, Hilary A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMILTON MELANIE MAUREEN