Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2019 at 05:39:34 (UTC).

BENITO ZUNIGA VS SAMANTHA MAE ADRIANO ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/06/2018 BENITO ZUNIGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAMANTHA MAE ADRIANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, JON R. TAKASUGI and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2972

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

JON R. TAKASUGI

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

ZUNIGA BENITO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

TAUSCHER TANYA

DOES 1-20

ADRIANO SAMANTHA MAE

ADRIANO EMMANUEL

ZUNIGA BENITO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

ADRIANO SAMANTHA MAE

ADRIANO EMMANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NEZHAD|SHAYESTEH

JOHNSON JERRY LEE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

OPFELL CHRISTOPHER K. ESQ.

FUJITA BRIAN YUTAKA

MARS MICHAEL STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

11/13/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES) OF 11/20/2019

11/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES) OF 11/20/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

11/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/31/2018: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/15/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities -

10/16/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities -

Reply - Defendant's Relpy to Plaintiff's Memmorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

10/22/2018: Reply - Defendant's Relpy to Plaintiff's Memmorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer

11/13/2018: Answer

Notice of Ruling

11/13/2018: Notice of Ruling

Demand for Jury Trial

11/13/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/13/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Order - Ruling Re: Demurrer to the Complaint

10/29/2018: Order - Ruling Re: Demurrer to the Complaint

DECLARATION

9/18/2018: DECLARATION

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

10/29/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Benito Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:43 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Consolidation of Cases) of 11/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Consolidation of Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Docketat 2:24 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 11/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Benito Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 11:45 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Benito Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Benito Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Benito Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benito Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OPFELL CHRISTOPHER K. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARS MICHAEL STANLEY