This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2021 at 11:13:28 (UTC).

BENITO PENALOZA VS KOOS MANUFACTURING, INC., A CORPORATE ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 BENITO PENALOZA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KOOS MANUFACTURING, INC , A CORPORATE ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5535

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENALOZA BENITO

Defendants

KOOS MANUFACTURING INC. A CORPORATE ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

KOOS MANUFACTURING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMAILI JIHAD

SMAILI JIHAD M.

Defendant Attorney

AMAN KALLEY R.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/28/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW:)

8/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW:)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW:) OF 08/06/2020

8/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW:) OF 08/06/2020

Answer

7/1/2020: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/2/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/20/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/20/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/24/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/23/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Koos Manufacturing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Benito Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to all named defendants) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:41 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW:) of 08/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Koos Manufacturing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Benito Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Benito Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benito Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Benito Penaloza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMAILI JIHAD M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMAILI JIHAD