Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2020 at 12:03:30 (UTC).

BENCHMARK INSURANCE VS SERHII STOLNYI

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 BENCHMARK INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SERHII STOLNYI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3929

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENCHMARK INSURANCE

Defendant

STOLNYI SERHII

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATHEWS TYRONE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

6/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/30/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/24/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Hearing12/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BENCHMARK INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BENCHMARK INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BENCHMARK INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BENCHMARK INSURANCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less