This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 11:55:40 (UTC).

BENANCIO DELGADO VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 BENANCIO DELGADO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0421

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELGADO BENANCIO

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/28/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • Hearing11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Hearing09/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Benancio Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Benancio Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Benancio Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benancio Delgado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA