This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 04:01:41 (UTC).

BENAIAH DISMUKE VS GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY CORP

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 BENAIAH DISMUKE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6733

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISMUKE BENAIAH

Defendant

GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MOLONEY MEEGAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/12/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

12/12/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/12/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/19/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

3/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURT?S RULING

3/12/2018: NOTICE OF COURT?S RULING

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER; DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;. AND DECLARATION OF MEEGAN MOLONEY

2/23/2018: DEFENDANT GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER; DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;. AND DECLARATION OF MEEGAN MOLONEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 47; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT S RULING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER; DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;. AND DECLARATION OF MEEGAN MOLONEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BENAIAH DISMUKE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less