This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 05:09:18 (UTC).

BENAIAH DISMUKE VS GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 BENAIAH DISMUKE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1149

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISMUKE BENAIAH

Defendant

GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ANGELO LISA D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/23/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

7/23/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT

Order - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

7/23/2020: Order - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice of Ruling

7/6/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

6/29/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

6/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

Case Management Statement

6/12/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND NOTION TO STRIKE PORTION'S OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND NOTION TO STRIKE PORTION'S OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Case Management Statement

4/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Complaint

11/15/2019: Complaint

Case Management Statement

3/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Judicial Notice

1/9/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

1/9/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order re Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike: Filed By: Grace Community Church of the Valley (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed Judgment: Filed By: Grace Community Church of the Valley (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed Judgment: Status Date changed from 07/06/2020 to 07/23/2020; Result Date changed from 07/23/2020 to 07/23/2020; As To Parties changed from Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff) to Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order re Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike: Status Date changed from 07/06/2020 to 07/23/2020; Result Date changed from 07/23/2020 to 07/23/2020; As To Parties changed from Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff) to Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Judgment scheduled for 08/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Grace Community Church of the Valley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Judgment scheduled for 08/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Grace Community Church of the Valley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 04/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Community Church of the Valley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Benaiah Dismuke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Patricia D. Nieto in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1149    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 24

Defendant Grace Community Church of the Valley’s demurrer to the Complaint is SUSTAINED. Defendant’s motion to strike is moot.

On November 15, 2019, Plaintiff Benaiah Dismuke (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant complaint against Defendant Grace Community Church of the Valley (“Defendant”). The Complaint contains vague allegations regarding an unknown “power or energy” that causes various maladies.

On January 9, 2020, Defendant demurred to the Complaint on uncertainty grounds and a motion to strike punitive damages. No opposition was filed. On June 19, 2020, Defendant filed a notice of non-opposition.

Legal Standard

A demurrer for sufficiency tests whether the complaint states a cause of action. (Hahn v. Mirda (2007) 147 Cal.App.4th 740, 747.) When considering demurrers, courts read the allegations liberally and in context. In a demurrer proceeding, the defects must be apparent on the face of the pleading or via proper judicial notice. (Donabedian v. Mercury Ins. Co. (2004) 116 Cal.App.4th 968, 994.) A demurrer tests the pleadings alone and not the evidence or other extrinsic matters. Therefore, it lies only where the defects appear on the face of the pleading or are judicially noticed. (CCP ;; 430.30, 430.70.) At the pleading stage, a plaintiff need only allege ultimate facts sufficient to apprise the defendant of the factual basis for the claim against him. (Semole v. Sansoucie (1972) 28 Cal. App. 3d 714, 721.) A “demurrer does not, however, admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law alleged in the pleading, or the construction of instruments pleaded, or facts impossible in law.” (S. Shore Land Co. v. Petersen (1964) 226 Cal.App.2d 725, 732 [internal citations omitted].)

A special demurrer for uncertainty, CCP section 430.10(f), is disfavored and will only be sustained where the pleading is so bad that defendant cannot reasonably respond—i.e., cannot reasonably determine what issues must be admitted or denied, or what counts or claims are directed against him/her. (Khoury v. Maly’s of Calif., Inc. (1993) 14 Cal.App.4th 612, 616.) Moreover, even if the pleading is somewhat vague, “ambiguities can be clarified under modern discovery procedures.” (Ibid.)

Meet and Confer

Before filing a demurrer or motion to strike, the moving party must meet and confer in person or by telephone with the party who filed the pleading to attempt to reach an agreement that would resolve the objections to the pleading. (CCP ;; 430.41, 435.5.) Counsel’s declaration satisfies the meet and confer requirement. (Angelo Decl. ¶¶ 2-4.)

Request for Judicial Notice

 

Defendant requests judicial notice of various court documents. (See RJN Exs. 1-3.) This request is GRANTED.

Discussion

 

Plaintiff’s complaint fails to state any cause of action and is uncertain. The factual allegations comprise of vague statements concerning a “force” or “power or energy.” There are allegations concerning how the government uses this force as a part of a religion. There are further allegations on how this force causes Plaintiff and others to experience physical/psychological harm. Even if these allegations are to be believed, Plaintiff has not explained how Defendant relates to this force or power. Thus, even if the Court were to assume the truth of the allegations, Plaintiff has not stated any facts against this Defendant. This renders the complaint uncertain, to say the least.

Accordingly, Defendant’s demurrer is SUSTAINED without leave to amend. The motion to strike is moot.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.