This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 07:32:19 (UTC).

BEN SHAOOL VS DARRISH DAVID ZARRINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 BEN SHAOOL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DARRISH DAVID ZARRINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2325

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAOOL BEN

Defendants

2135193 ONTARIO LTD

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOME SERVICES CALIFORNIA

EBRAHIMI ALI

KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY INC.

LAVI BEHROUZ

MALY ARCHITECTS INC.

MERZ CONSTRUCTION INC.

RINSCH DANIEL

SHMUELIAN AVRAHAM

STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY

ZARRINA DARRISH DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEHRANI NEGAR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ben Shaool (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ben Shaool (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ben Shaool (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOME SERVICES A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Stewart Titile Guaranty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEHRANI NEGAR