This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 06:49:47 (UTC).

BEN PIAZZA, ET AL. VS CBS BROADCASTING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 BEN PIAZZA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CBS BROADCASTING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, MAREN NELSON and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2511

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

MAREN NELSON

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIAZZA BEN

MALLARD PETER

BERUTI MARC

STONES DENISE

SALAS JULIAN

PERRY NANCY

CIMO BARBRA

BELLOTTI KEVIN

RUSS LINDA

SMITH FREDERICK

LAWRENCE-MILLER JODY

LABGOLD RICHARD

AKUTAGAWA JERILYNNE

NUGENT RON

LAWRENCE TRACY

BOSIO ROBERTO

Defendants

CBS BROADCASTING INC.

HACKMAN CAPITAL PARTNERS LCC

TELEVISION CITY PRODUCTIONS LLC

MICHAEL HACKMAN & ASSOCIATES

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KREGER WAYNE S.

Defendant Attorneys

ROBINSON BLAIR J.

CHO KAREN Y.

CONWAY CATHERINE ANNE

PRIEL STEPHANIE P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEES (BLAI...)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEES (BLAI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMOVAL)

7/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMOVAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMOVAL) OF 07/10/2020

7/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE REMOVAL) OF 07/10/2020

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 17 HEARING TO APRIL 23, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M. VIA E-MAIL

3/17/2020: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 17 HEARING TO APRIL 23, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M. VIA E-MAIL

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF STEPHANIE PRIEL AND LARA GRINES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CBS BROADCASTING INC.

3/25/2020: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF STEPHANIE PRIEL AND LARA GRINES ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CBS BROADCASTING INC.

Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFFS OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

3/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFFS OF REMOVAL OF ACTION

Notice - CBS BROADCASTING INCS NOTICE OF COURT'S APRIL 14, 2020 ORDER

4/20/2020: Notice - CBS BROADCASTING INCS NOTICE OF COURT'S APRIL 14, 2020 ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer - CBS BROADCASTING INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/26/2020: Answer - CBS BROADCASTING INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF BLAIR J. ROBINSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

3/6/2020: Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF BLAIR J. ROBINSON TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (AMENDED)

11/27/2019: Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (AMENDED)

Notice of Appearance

2/27/2020: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

3/2/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF BLAIR J. ROBINSON

3/2/2020: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF BLAIR J. ROBINSON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Report

3/10/2020: Status Conference Report

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees (Blair J. Robinson)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees (Blai...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Removal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Removal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Removal) of 07/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCBS Broadcasting Incs Notice of Court's April 14, 2020 order; Filed by CBS Broadcasting, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:47 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (to State Court and Plaintiffs of Removal of Action); Filed by CBS Broadcasting, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 01/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion of Plaintiffs for Peremptory Disqualification; Filed by Ben Piazza (Plaintiff); Joel Binger (Plaintiff); Kevin Bellotti (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Wayne S. Kreger, Esq. in Support of Motion of Plaintiff For Peremptory Disqualification); Filed by Ben Piazza (Plaintiff); Joel Binger (Plaintiff); Kevin Bellotti (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 12/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ben Piazza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ben Piazza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketComplex Civil Case Questionnaire; Filed by Ben Piazza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HACKMAN CAPITAL PARTNERS LCC is a litigant

Latest cases where CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KREGER WAYNE S. ESQ.