This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 11:37:28 (UTC).

BEN NYE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BAILEY & PARTNERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 BEN NYE CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against BAILEY PARTNERS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4284

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEN NYE CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

BAILEY & PARTNERS

BAILEY PATRICK E.

DURHAM JON DOUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS ESQ RICK

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS KENNY CANNON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/2/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/8/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/8/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

11/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Complaint

7/27/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2024
  • Hearing06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 updated: Result Date to 07/10/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: BEN NYE CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BAILEY & PARTNERS (Defendant); PATRICK E. BAILEY (Defendant); JON DOUGLAS DURHAM (Defendant); As to: BEN NYE CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 36 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BEN NYE CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BAILEY & PARTNERS (Defendant); PATRICK E. BAILEY (Defendant); JON DOUGLAS DURHAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BEN NYE CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BAILEY & PARTNERS (Defendant); PATRICK E. BAILEY (Defendant); JON DOUGLAS DURHAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BEN NYE CO., INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: BAILEY & PARTNERS (Defendant); PATRICK E. BAILEY (Defendant); JON DOUGLAS DURHAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less