This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 12:02:07 (UTC).

BEN JEWELRY, INC.., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL. VS ROBERT RECHNITZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 BEN JEWELRY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERT RECHNITZ, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4980

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DINA YOSSI AN INDIVIDUAL

BEN JEWELRY INC.. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

BOMEL JERUSALEM I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL JERUSALEM 2 LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BOMEL/MALIBU LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MADISON BOMEL LA BREA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL/4114 SEPULVEDA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RECHNITZ ROBERT AN INDIVIDUAL DBA BOMEL ISRAEL LTD.

BOMEL SAN FRANCISCO EQUITIES I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL COMPANIES AKA BOMEL MANAGEMENT AKA BOMEL DEVELOPMENT

BOMEL CULVER CITY EQUITIES I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL SAN DIEGO EQUITIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BROAD STREET SAN FRANCISCO EQUITIES I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL/SWALL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MARTEL LOFTS LLC

TMG-BOMEL I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL NEW YORK EQUITIES 1 LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BOMEL FLORIDA EQUITIES I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANK MICHAEL FAIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/20/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/15/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

6/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ben Jewelry, Inc.., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Yossi Dina, , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ben Jewelry, Inc.., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Yossi Dina, , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ben Jewelry, Inc.., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Yossi Dina, , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ben Jewelry, Inc.., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Yossi Dina, , an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOMEL/SWALL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BOMEL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEN JEWELRY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BOMEL SAN DIEGO EQUITIES LLC is a litigant