This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 02:40:36 (UTC).

BEN F. SMITH, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BNBUILDERS, INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 BEN F SMITH, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BNBUILDERS, INC , A WASHINGTON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6095

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEN F. SMITH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BNBUILDERS INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINK BARET C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

7/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BEN F. SMITH, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BEN F. SMITH, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BEN F. SMITH, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BEN F. SMITH, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEN F. SMITH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION DBA PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINK BARET C.