This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 05:07:02 (UTC).

BEN BRAY, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 BEN BRAY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0176

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

BRAY VANESSA

STEPHAN XIAOLAN HUANG

MACLEOD KEITH

KHORDODI JOLYNN DOSTAL

PEDERSEN JARED

BRAY BEN

EARLE TERESA F.

JOHNSON MATT

KOPPENHAVER FIONA

SMITH CARLA BOWMAN

PURTELL RUSSELL ALLAN

SCHACK DAVID P.

MAGICK INANNYA

SMOKEY THE BEAR PROPERTIES LLC

BUBEACHHOMES INC.

GREENFIELD FAMILY PARTNERSHIP

JUNG JUNG SIK

CRAIR DANIELA Z.

SILVER STRAND INC.

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Interested Parties and Plaintiffs

KHORDODI JOLYNN DOSTAL

KOPPENHAVER FIONA

SCHACK DAVID P.

253 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

WALSH ANDREW KILEY

BEZEK PETER JAMES

ROBERTSON ALEXANDER IV

Plaintiff and Interested Party Attorney

ROBERTSON ALEXANDER IV

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS

9/30/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS

8/27/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/20/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

7/21/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

9/1/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFER...)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PR...)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

73 More Documents Available
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Silver Strand Salon, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTSON ALEXANDER IV