This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2023 at 06:59:56 (UTC).

BELTRAN, VICTORIA GARCIA VS BELTRAN, DANNY RAY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 BELTRAN, VICTORIA GARCIA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BELTRAN, DANNY RAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WEINBERGER, WILLIAM E. and LIPNER, JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2033

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WEINBERGER, WILLIAM E.

LIPNER, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELTRAN VICTORIA GARCIA

Respondent

BELTRAN DANNY RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHOOK MICHAEL DITTRICH

Respondent Attorney

WALLERSTEIN MICHAEL AARON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/28/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/5/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

12/5/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/2/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Substitution of Attorney - Michael Wallerstein Sub In

12/1/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Michael Wallerstein Sub In

Notice - Unavailability of Counsel - Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

12/1/2022: Notice - Unavailability of Counsel - Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

12/1/2022: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO

12/1/2022: Proposed Form 116 - Reissuance TRO

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

12/1/2022: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

12/1/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/15/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - DV-100, DV-109, DV-110

11/15/2022: Proof of Service - DV-100, DV-109, DV-110

Minute Order

11/15/2022: Minute Order

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

10/27/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

10/27/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

10/27/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

10/27/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

10/27/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 83, Lipner, Joseph, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F58, Weinberger, William E., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (DV-100, DV-109, DV-110 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less