This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2022 at 04:36:47 (UTC).

BELMONTE, WILLIAM VS MONROID BELMONTE, RHEA KARENE

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 BELMONTE, WILLIAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MONROID BELMONTE, RHEA KARENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MORDETZKY, MARILYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0693

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MORDETZKY, MARILYN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELMONTE WILLIAM

Respondent

MONROID BELMONTE RHEA KARENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOWEN SETH CHRISTIAN

Respondent Attorney

CABRERA CRISTAL LISA

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

11/29/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

11/29/2022: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/29/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

11/28/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

11/28/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration To Request For Order

11/14/2022: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration To Request For Order

Substitution of Attorney - OUT: RALPH KOTTKE

11/7/2022: Substitution of Attorney - OUT: RALPH KOTTKE

Certificate of Completion - Certificate of Completion

11/2/2022: Certificate of Completion - Certificate of Completion

FCS-Mediation Memo

11/2/2022: FCS-Mediation Memo

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

10/26/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Certificate of Completion - Certificate of Completion

10/25/2022: Certificate of Completion - Certificate of Completion

Substitution of Attorney - IN: SETH C. BOWEN

10/20/2022: Substitution of Attorney - IN: SETH C. BOWEN

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/11/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

5/11/2022: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/11/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/11/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Amended (1st)

6/15/2022: Petition - Amended (1st)

Summons - Amended

6/15/2022: Summons - Amended

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department K at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; RFO - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Mordetzky, Marilyn, Presiding; RFO - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration To Request For Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPetition - Amended (1st); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSummons - Amended; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less