Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 02:28:49 (UTC).

BELASCO UNLIMITED CORPORATION, VS UNDERRATED PRESENTS, INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 BELASCO UNLIMITED CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNDERRATED PRESENTS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9645

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELASCO UNLIMITED CORPORATION

Defendants

UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC.

BITAR CYRIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE FRANK N.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (VERIFIED BY CLERK)

3/26/2021: Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (VERIFIED BY CLERK)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT...) OF 03/26/2021

3/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT...) OF 03/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT...)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/20/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/03/2020

11/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 11/03/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment (Due 3/17))) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default...) of 03/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment ((verified by clerk)); Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 11/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Belasco Unlimited Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BELASCO UNLIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE FRANK N.