Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 22:55:32 (UTC).

BEL AIR K.A., LLC VS 5 SITES INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 BEL AIR K A , LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 5 SITES INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4593

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEL AIR K.A. LLC

Defendants

5 SITES INC.

ATLANTIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

HANMI BANK

OLIVE M.V. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS PAUL

Defendant Attorney

VIVOLI MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Lis Pendens

7/9/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

4/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/14/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/14/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/14/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Bel Air K.A., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 5 Sites Inc. (Defendant); Olive M.V., LLC (Defendant); Atlantic Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by 5 Sites Inc. (Defendant); Olive M.V., LLC (Defendant); Atlantic Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bel Air K.A., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bel Air K.A., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Bel Air K.A., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bel Air K.A., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bel Air K.A., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bel Air K.A., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5 SITES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where OLIVE M V LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Atlantic Property Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hanmi Bank is a litigant