Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2021 at 02:41:36 (UTC).

BEECHER, THOMAS - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 BEECHER, THOMAS - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1307

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEECHER ISABELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HODES DANIEL MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/2/2021: Minute Order

Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. - Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

6/17/2020: Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. - Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct.

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

4/16/2020: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Minute Order

4/16/2020: Minute Order

Order - Deposit Funds

4/16/2020: Order - Deposit Funds

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

4/9/2020: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

4/9/2020: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

12/4/2019: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

2/13/2020: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

2/13/2020: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

Minute Order

2/14/2020: Minute Order

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

2/19/2020: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Rejected Proposed Order

2/19/2020: Rejected Proposed Order

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

2/19/2020: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Rejected Proposed Order

2/19/2020: Rejected Proposed Order

Supplement - First Verified Supplement to Petition for Minor's Compromise

2/27/2020: Supplement - First Verified Supplement to Petition for Minor's Compromise

Minute Order

3/18/2020: Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReceipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. (Receipt - Acknowledgment of Ord for Deposit in Blocked Acct. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSupplement (First Verified Supplement to Petition for Minor's Compromise ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HODES DANIEL M