This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 07:15:36 (UTC).

BEAUTIE MOORE ET AL VS MICHAEL NAGEOTTE MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 BEAUTIE MOORE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MICHAEL NAGEOTTE MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8795

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON CRESHINDA

Defendants

SEET EMILY; M.D.

LEESTMA MICHELE; RDMS

ANSELMO DEAN; M.D. [DOE 2]

BERKOWITZ KATHLEEN; M.D.

NAGEOTTE MICHAEL; M.D.

NGUYEN NAM X.; M.D.

MICHAEL P. NAGEOTTE M.D. INC.

OBSTETRIX MEDICAL GROUP OF CALIF. APC

HAYDON MICHAEL; M.D.

OBSTETRIX MEDICAL GROUP OF CALIFORNIA

Respondent and Defendant

OBSTETRIX MEDICAL GROUP OF CALIFORNIA

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE G. FAGEL & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorneys

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES

LAW + BRANDMEYER LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MARIANO A. ALVAREZ LAW OFFICES OF

PACKER O'LEARY AND CORSON

HOLM MARGARET M.

SELVIN WRAITH HALMAN LLP

ET. CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN MCBRIDE

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS DEAN ANSELMO, M.D. AND LATISHA DEYOUNG, N.P.

2/13/2018: STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS DEAN ANSELMO, M.D. AND LATISHA DEYOUNG, N.P.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/14/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTJCE OF TIME CHANGE RE CAS MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR

2/26/2018: NOTJCE OF TIME CHANGE RE CAS MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS; DECLARATION OF YUK K. LAW, ESQ.

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS; DECLARATION OF YUK K. LAW, ESQ.

DECLARATION OF KARA KNOWLES, JD, CPHRM

3/7/2018: DECLARATION OF KARA KNOWLES, JD, CPHRM

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

3/8/2018: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/9/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

3/13/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO DEFENDANT, HA SON NGUYEN, M.D., ONLY

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO DEFENDANT, HA SON NGUYEN, M.D., ONLY

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF BRUCE G. FAGEL IN SUPPORT OF HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR

3/20/2018: DECLARATION OF BRUCE G. FAGEL IN SUPPORT OF HEARING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR

PETITION TO ESTABLISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

3/21/2018: PETITION TO ESTABLISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Unknown

3/21/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF KARA KNOWLES, JD, CPHRM IN FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

3/22/2018: OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF KARA KNOWLES, JD, CPHRM IN FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

DECLARATION OF MARIA HOVSEPIAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

3/22/2018: DECLARATION OF MARIA HOVSEPIAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Joetta; MSN R.N. Wallace (Defendant); Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bruce G. Fagel & Associates (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice ( OF APPEARANCE BY COURT CALL AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Bruce G. Fagel & Associates (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Elizabeth; M.D. Blumenthal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joetta; MSN R.N. Wallace (Defendant); Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
307 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Beautie Moore (Legacy Party); Creshinda Johnson (Plaintiff); William Moore (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Beautie Moore (Legacy Party); Creshinda Johnson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE HEALTH SERVICES RE PENDING ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CFVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE/ MEDICAL MALPRACTICE, ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beautie Moore (Legacy Party); Creshinda Johnson (Plaintiff); William Moore (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketReceipt-Depository; Filed by Beautie Moore (Legacy Party); Creshinda Johnson (Plaintiff); William Moore (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8795    Hearing Date: June 22, 2020    Dept: 24

The Court having reviewed and heard the Petition, the Court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petition. (CRC Rule 7.950.) The Court intends to sign the proposed Orders (MC-351, MC-355). The Court does not find personal appearance necessary, given the current COVID-19 pandemic. (CRC Rule 7.952(a).)

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE COMPLIANCE/PROOF OF RECEIPT OF DEPOSIT ON October 22, 2020 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance required if receipt filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



Case Number: ****8795    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 24

The Court having reviewed and heard the Petition, the Court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petition. (CRC Rule 7.950.) The Court intends to sign the proposed Orders (MC-351, MC-355). The Court also finds good cause for the minor to not appear, given her medical condition and young age. (CRC Rule 7.952(a).) The net settlement, less costs and fees, will be placed in the pre-existing Beatie Moore Special Needs Trust with Wells Fargo Bank as Trustee.

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE COMPLIANCE/PROOF OF RECEIPT OF DEPOSIT ON March 2, 2020 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance required if receipt filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OBSTETRIX MEDICAL GROUP OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLM MARGARET M