This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 06:49:50 (UTC).

BEATRIZ SILVA VS TAVARUS ALLEN STERLING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 BEATRIZ SILVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TAVARUS ALLEN STERLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1616

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVA BEATRIZ

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC.

CITY PRIVATE SECURITY INC.

ALLIED UNIVERSAL EXECUTIVE PROTECTION INTELLIGENCE SERVICES INC.

STERLING TAVARUS ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAHIMI F. JAY

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

7/26/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/7/2021: PI General Order

Demand for Jury Trial

4/12/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Beatriz Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Beatriz Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beatriz Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beatriz Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beatriz Silva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED UNIVERSAL EXECUTIVE PROTECTION AND INTELLIGENCE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHIMI F. JAY