This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 15:57:59 (UTC).

BEATRIZ ROSALES, ET AL. VS WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 BEATRIZ ROSALES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4976

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VELASQUEZ ANDREW

VELASQUEZ ADRIAN JR.

ROSALES BEATRIZ

SUCHITE STEVEN

SUCHITE SAMANTHA

Defendants

MASSIE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC

WILLIAM PENN VENTURES LLC.

LEONARDO MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

FIELDS GARY D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/1/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

PI General Order

11/4/2019: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/4/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/4/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/4/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/4/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

2/28/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/28/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/13/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

11/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC., (Defendant); MASSIE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC., (Defendant); MASSIE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC., (Defendant); MASSIE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff); Adrian Jr. Velasquez (Plaintiff); Andrew Velasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff); Adrian Jr. Velasquez (Plaintiff); Andrew Velasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff); Adrian Jr. Velasquez (Plaintiff); Andrew Velasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff); Adrian Jr. Velasquez (Plaintiff); Andrew Velasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff); Adrian Jr. Velasquez (Plaintiff); Andrew Velasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Beatriz Rosales (Plaintiff); Adrian Jr. Velasquez (Plaintiff); Andrew Velasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where William Penn Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEONARDO MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN