This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 03:35:36 (UTC).

BEATRIZ ESTRADA VS WORLDPAC, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 BEATRIZ ESTRADA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WORLDPAC, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAREN NELSON, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1715

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAREN NELSON

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA BEATRIZ

Defendant

WORLDPAC INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOURMAND MICHAEL

BARTH MICHAEL SCOTT

DE SARIO JAMES A.

Defendant Attorneys

SIEGAL ADAM Y.

PETERSON JESSICA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

5/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE RESPONSE STATEMENT

4/29/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE RESPONSE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT WORLDPAC, INC.

3/4/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT WORLDPAC, INC.

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

3/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT) OF 02/09/2022

2/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT) OF 02/09/2022

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (WORLDPAC, INC.)

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS (WORLDPAC, INC.)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 02/23/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 02/23/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Initial Status Conference Order

2/23/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 01/24/2022

1/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 01/24/2022

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/20/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/14/2022: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Response Statement; Filed by Beatriz Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Beatriz Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance (for Defendant Worldpac, Inc.); Filed by Worldpac, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 11:15 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 01/24/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Beatriz Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beatriz Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beatriz Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beatriz Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLDPAC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGAL ADAM Y