This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 09:03:49 (UTC).

BEATRICE ESSAH VS GOVENING BOARD OF THE LA UNIFIED SCHOOL D

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 BEATRICE ESSAH filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GOVENING BOARD OF THE LA UNIFIED SCHOOL D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8459

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ESSAH BEATRICE

Defendants and Respondents

RODRIGUEZ REF DR.

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

SCHMERELSON SCOTT M.

GOVENING BOARD OF THE LOS ANGELES UNITED

GARCIA MONICA

RATLIFF MONICA

MCKENNA GEORGE J. DR. III

ZIMMER STEVEN

CHAIT ANDRES

DEASY JOHN

AVILA JUSTO

VLADOVIC DR. RICHARD A.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

ORTIZ FREDDY

HOLMQUIST DAVID

HARRINGTON MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ESSAH BEATRICE

RONALD C. LAPEKAS ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/8/2018: Minute Order

Summons

10/11/2018: Summons

Minute Order

10/12/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/12/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

12/13/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/13/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/23/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS CLAIMS 142 U.S.C. ? 1981, 1983, 1985, 1988) 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER COLOR OF STATE LAW (42 U.S.C. ? 1983); ETC.

4/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS CLAIMS 142 U.S.C. ? 1981, 1983, 1985, 1988) 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER COLOR OF STATE LAW (42 U.S.C. ? 1983); ETC.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

5/5/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

6/21/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/21/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF RONALD C. LAPEKAS IN LIEU OF FILING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RESPONSE TO OSC RE SERVICE

8/21/2017: DECLARATION OF RONALD C. LAPEKAS IN LIEU OF FILING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RESPONSE TO OSC RE SERVICE

Minute Order

9/21/2017: Minute Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 12/13/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; (OSC RE Dismissal; Proceeding continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-06-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS CLAIMS 142 U.S.C. 1981, 1983, 1985, 1988) 1. VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER COLOR OF STATE LAW (42 U.S.C. 1983); ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC658459    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 5

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

beatrice essah ,

Plaintiff,

v.

governing board of the la unified school district , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC658459

ORDER TRANSFERRING NON-PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASES TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

DEPARTMENT 5 OF THE PERSONAL INJURY (PI) COURT HAS DETERMINED THAT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE:

ARE NOT “PERSONAL INJURY” CASES AS DEFINED IN THE COURT’S MOST RECENT GENERAL ORDER RE GENERAL JURISDICTION PERSONAL INJURY CASES – FILING LOCATION.

THIS CASE IS HEREBY SENT TO DEPARTMENT 1 FOR REASSIGNMENT TO AN IC COURT.

ANY PENDING MOTIONS OR HEARINGS, INCLUDING TRIAL OR STATUS CONFERENCE, WILL BE RESET, CONTINUED OR VACATED AT THE DIRECTION OF THE NEWLY ASSIGNED IC COURT.

___________________________   

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court