Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2020 at 03:14:52 (UTC).

BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC., VS ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLIED ROOFING WATERPROOFING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7060

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEACON SALES ACQUISITION INC. DBA LOWRY'S SPECIALTY DISTRIBUTION

Defendants

1871 STANLEY DEVELOPMENT LLC

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

MATHIASON JEREMY RAY DBA SUMMIT WEST

ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGEN SAMANTHA R.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

9/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/4/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice (Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens); Filed by Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIGGEN SAMANTHA