This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 05:06:56 (UTC).

BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. VS ALQUEST TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 BEACH WIRE CABLE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALQUEST TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0506

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEACH WIRE & CABLE INC.

Defendants

ALQUEST TECHNOLOGIES INC.

WOJCIK HENRY J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBAUM MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/18/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Judgment

11/2/2021: Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

11/2/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Dismissal

10/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

10/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation for Judgment

10/22/2021: Stipulation for Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

11/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

11/9/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

11/9/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

11/4/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER); Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles )); Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (-Partial); Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BEACH WIRE & CABLE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBAUM MARTIN